SC S0341 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Each Birthing Facility Licensed By The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Perform A Pulse Oximetry Screening, Or Another Approved Screening To Detect Congenital Heart Defects, On Every Newborn In Its Care, When The Baby Is Twenty-four To Forty-eight Hours Of Age, Or As Late As Possible If The Baby Is Discharged From The Hospital Before Reaching Twenty-four Hours Of Age
Title
Emerson Rose Act
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] | Sen. Glenn Reese [D] | Sen. Michael Fair [R] | Sen. Joel Lourie [D] |
Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] | Sen. Larry Martin [R] | Sen. Paul Campbell [R] | Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] |
Sen. Robert Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Act No. 64 | |
2013-06-20 | Effective date 09/11/13 | |
2013-06-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-06-11 | Ratified R 77 | |
2013-06-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2013-06-06 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2013-05-29 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2013-05-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-7 |
2013-05-28 | House | Read second time |
2013-05-28 | House | Amended |
2013-05-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-05-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-04-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |