SC S0339 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Amendment To Section 7, Article Iii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The Qualifications Of Senators And Members Of The House Of Representatives, So As To Authorize The General Assembly To Enact Term Limitations For Its Members By Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly Members; enact term limits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3257 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
H3260 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
S0302 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0384 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3746 (Similar To) 2021-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback