SC S0334 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Act No. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To Permits To Purchase And Sell Beer And Wine For On-premises Consumption And A Biennial License To Purchase Alcoholic Liquors By The Drink At A Motorsports Entertainment Complex Or Tennis Specific Complex, To Include Baseball Complex, And To Provide A Definition For "baseball Complex".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits for alcohol at motorsport and tennis events

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 55 N: 46 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Adjourn Debate (Y: 49 N: 52 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Table The Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 50 N: 51 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Act No. 33
2017-05-17 Effective date 05/10/17
2017-05-10 Signed By Governor
2017-05-09 Ratified R 53
2017-05-09HouseRead third time and enrolled
2017-05-04HouseRoll call Yeas-55 Nays-46
2017-05-04HouseRead second time
2017-04-27HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-03-30SenateRead third time and sent to House
2017-03-29SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2017-03-29SenateRead second time
2017-03-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-03-22SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Shealy (ch), Hutto, Senn
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3139 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Act No. 236
S0777 (Similar To) 2018-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
614515(n/a)See Bill Text
6162016(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback