SC S0334 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A Senate Resolution To Request That The Department Of Natural Resources Conduct A Statewide Study Of Boating Safety Issues And Make Recommendations To The General Assembly To Improve Boating Safety On The Waters Of The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boating safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-10SenateAdopted
2015-03-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2015-03-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
2015-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2015-01-13SenateIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback