SC S0334 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Create The Joint Information Security Oversight Committee To Conduct A Continuing Study Of The Laws Of This State Affecting Cyber Security, Including The Receipt Of Impediments To Improved Cyber Security, And To Provide For The Membership Of The Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identity Theft Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-17HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-04-17HouseIntroduced and read first time
2013-04-16SenateRead third time and sent to House
2013-04-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-11SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2013-04-11SenateRead second time
2013-04-11SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2013-04-11SenateAmended
2013-04-10SenateAmended
2013-04-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-09SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2013-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-03-20SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2013-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2013-02-06SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13240(n/a)See Bill Text
13010(n/a)See Bill Text
124352(n/a)See Bill Text
1261141(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0334&session=120&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130206.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130409.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130410.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130411.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130412.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/334_20130415.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=5846
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=5855

Bill Comments 750

feedback