SC S0326 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Direct The State Law Enforcement Division To Distribute Two Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars To The South Carolina State Firefighters Association To Provide For Post Traumatic Stress Disorder Insurance And Programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SLED; distribute 250,000 dollars to the SC State Firefighters Association to provide PTSD insurance and programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-01-23SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-01-22SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2019-01-22SenateRead second time
2019-01-16SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback