SC S0324 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Include Persons Who Are Retired From Certain Offices And Clerks Of Court In The Purview Of The Statute.
Title
Concealed weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended |
2017-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Timmons, Rice |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3205 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Putnam