SC S0324 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge Over Highway 123 At The Intersection Of Highway 123 And Road 37-18 As The Samuel Maverick Bridge And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At The Bridge That Contain The Words "samuel Maverick Bridge".
Title
Samuel Maverick Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |