SC S0321 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Further Provide For The Manner Of And Dates For Filing Notices Of Candidacy For Election To These Offices
Title
Greenwood County Board of Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 303 | |
2012-04-04 | Effective date 04/02/12 | |
2012-04-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Ratified R 148 | |
2012-03-28 | Roll call Ayes-2 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-28 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled | |
2012-03-23 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments | |
2012-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-03-22 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2012-03-22 | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-22 | Read second time | |
2012-03-22 | Amended | |
2012-03-21 | Recalled from Greenwood Delegation | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Greenwood Delegation | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-01-19 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-01-18 | Read second time | |
2011-01-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-01-11 | Intd. & placed on local & uncontested cal. w/o reference | |
2010-12-15 | Placed on Local and Uncontested Calendar | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3243 (Similar To) 2011-08-23 - Act No. 85