SC S0318 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Debate adjourned until Wed. 9-23-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Debate adjourned until Wed. 9-23-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Title 11 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Public Finance, By Adding Chapter 60, To Enact The "south Carolina Pay For Success Performance Accountability Act", To Establish The Trust Fund For Performance Accountability To Fund Pay-for-success Contracts, Whereby The State Contracts With A Private-sector Organization To Achieve Specifically Defined Measureable Outcomes In Which The State Pays Only To The Extent That The Desired Outcomes Are Achieved.
Title
SC Pay for Success Performance Accountability Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed. 9-23-20 |
2020-02-19 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-17-20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-02-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3591 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Committed to Committee on Ways and Means