SC S0316 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The State Board Of Education, Relating To At-risk Students, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4656, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
SC Board of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-05-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-9-17 |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |