SC S0313 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Recommitted to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Recommitted to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish A School District Choice Program And Open Enrollment Program Within The Public School System Of This State, To Provide For A Voluntary Pilot Testing Of The Program Before Full Implementation, To Define Certain Terms, To Provide For An Application Process For Students Wishing To Transfer, To Provide Responsibilities, Standards, And Criteria Concerning Sending And Receiving Schools And School Districts, To Provide Standards Of Approval, Priorities For Accepting Students And Criteria For Denying Students, To Provide That With Certain Exceptions The Parent Is Responsible For Transporting The Student To School, To Provide That Districts Shall Receive One Hundred Percent Of The Base Student Cost From The State For Nonresident Students Enrolled Pursuant To This Chapter, To Provide That A Student Generally May Not Participate In Interscholastic Athletic Contests And Competitions For One Year After His Date Of Enrollment, To Provide That A Receiving District Shall Accept Certain Credits Toward A Student's Requirements For Graduation And Shall Award A Diploma To A Nonresident Student Who Meets All Requirements For Graduation, To Provide That A School District May Contract With Certain Entities For The Provision Of Services, To Provide That The State Department Of Education Annually Shall Survey School Districts To Determine Participation In The Open Enrollment Program And Provide Certain Deleted Reports On The Program To The General Assembly, To Provide A District May Receive Certain Waivers Concerning The Implementation Of This Act, And To Provide That Implementation Of This Program Each Fiscal Year Is Contingent Upon The Appropriation Of Adequate Funding By The General Assembly.
Title
School district choice program and open enrollment program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Education |
2013-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-03-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |