SC S0301 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Malloy, Gustafson, Reichenbach
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 1-7-920, Relating To The Membership Of The Commission On Prosecution Coordination, So As To Add The Attorney General For The Term For Which He Is Elected Or His Designee To The Membership Of The Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosecution Coordination Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Malloy, Gustafson, Reichenbach
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2022-12-07SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-12-07SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3925 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17920(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback