SC S0301 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Add A Cross-reference
Title
SC Board of Accountancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Act No. 51 | |
2015-06-08 | Effective date 06/03/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-02 | Ratified R 82 | |
2015-05-28 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-0 |
2015-05-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-27-15 |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3179 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 2 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 560 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |