SC S0293 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 23-31-232 So As To Provide A Concealed Weapon Permit Holder May Carry A Concealable Weapon On School Property Leased By A Church For Church Services Or Official Church Activities If The Church Or Its Governing Body Provides Express Permission To The Permit Holder, And To Provide That This Section Only Applies During The Time That The Church Has Access To The Property For Its Services Or Activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed weapons permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDebate adjourned
2020-09-23HouseDebate adjourned
2020-09-22HouseRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-04-10SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-04-10SenateRead second time
2019-04-10SenateAmended
2019-04-10SenateCommittee Amendment Tabled
2019-04-04 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, Cash
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2331232(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback