SC S0290 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Sections 44-7-110, 44-7-120, 44-7-130, 44-7-140, 44-7-150, And 44-7-320 Of The 1976 Code, All Relating To The Regulation Of Health Care Facilities In The State, To Eliminate References To Certificate Of Need Requirements; To Repeal Sections 44-7-160, 44-7-170, 44-7-180, 44-7-190, 44-7-200, 44-7-210, 44-7-220, 44-7-225, 44-7-230, And 44-7-240 Of The 1976 Code, All Relating To The Certificate Of Need Program; And To Rename Article 3, Chapter 7, Title 44 Of The 1976 Code As The "state Health Facility Licensure Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health Facility Licensure Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number 1a (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2022-01-26HouseIntroduced and read first time
2022-01-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-01-25SenateRoll call Ayes-35 Nays-6
2022-01-25SenateRead third time and sent to House
2022-01-25SenateAmended
2022-01-20 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-01-19SenateRoll call Ayes-33 Nays-11
2022-01-19SenateRead second time
2022-01-19SenateAmended
2022-01-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-01-12SenateDebate interrupted
2022-01-12SenateAmended
2022-01-11SenateSpecial order, set for January 11, 2022
2021-04-29 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-04-28SenateRecalled from Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3161 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Felder
H3223 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Hiott, Erickson, Lowe, Hewitt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
447110(n/a)See Bill Text
447120(n/a)See Bill Text
447130(n/a)See Bill Text
447140(n/a)See Bill Text
447150(n/a)See Bill Text
447160(n/a)See Bill Text
447170(n/a)See Bill Text
447180(n/a)See Bill Text
447190(n/a)See Bill Text
447200(n/a)See Bill Text
447210(n/a)See Bill Text
447220(n/a)See Bill Text
447225(n/a)See Bill Text
447230(n/a)See Bill Text
447240(n/a)See Bill Text
447320(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0290&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20210428.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20210429.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20220112.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20220113.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20220119.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20220120.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20220125.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/290_20220126.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0290%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19877
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19890
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19916

Bill Comments

feedback