SC S0289 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Codify Existing Budget Provisos Relating To The Distribution Of Certain Crime Victim Funds, And To Require The Department Of Crime Victim Assistance Grants To Offer Training And Assistance On The Use Of Certain Funds And Provide For Auditing And Reporting Procedures For Victim Services Providers, Respectively
Title
SC Crime Victim Services Act
Sponsors
Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Luke Rankin [R] | Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] | Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] |
Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Act No. 96 | |
2017-06-21 | Effective date 07/01/17 | |
2017-06-10 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-06-06 | Ratified R 126 | |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-0 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2017-06-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2017-06-06 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hutto, Shealy, Timmons |
2017-05-10 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Tallon, Weeks, McCoy |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-4-17 |
2017-05-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-0 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Rice, Timmons |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3827 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 11 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 445 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1180 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 5 | 445 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 6 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 6 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 6 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 3 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 480 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |