SC S0289 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Delete References To A Committee Organized Directly Or Indirectly Established, Financed, Maintained, Or Controlled By A Candidate Or Public Official.
Title
Political action committee
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Thomas Davis [R] | Sen. Shane Massey [R] | Sen. Michael Rose [R] |
Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-15 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0633 (Similar To) 2011-03-17 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0289&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/289_20101215.htm |