SC S0284 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Posting Of Information Regarding The National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline In Certain Business Establishments, Provide The Language For The Posting, And Provide A Penalty For Failure To Post.
Title
Human trafficking resource hotline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-03-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Corbin, Young |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3391 (Similar To) 2013-05-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons