SC S0283 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To Education, By Adding Chapter 157, To Enact The "state Institution Of Higher Education Enterprise Act," To Allow The Board Of Trustees Of An Institution Of Higher Education To Establish By Resolution An Enterprise Division As Part Of The College Or University, To Provide That Certain Assets, Programs, And Operations Of The College Or University May Be Transferred To The Enterprise Division, To Provide That The Enterprise Division Is Exempt From Various State Laws Governing Procurement, Human Resources, Personnel, And The Disposition Of Real And Personal Property, With Some Such Exemptions Applying Automatically And Others Requiring Additional Actions By The Board Of Trustees, To Provide That Bonds, Notes, Or Other Evidence Of Indebtedness May Be Issued For The Enterprise Division, And To Provide Audit And Reporting Requirements; And To Amend Section 11-35-710, Relating To Exemptions From The South Carolina Consolidated Procurement Code, To Provide That The State Fiscal Accountability Authority May Exempt An Enterprise Division, If A Division Is Established Pursuant To Chapter 157, Title 59 And The Board Of Trustees Has Adopted A Procurement Policy For The Division That Was Approved By The State Fiscal Accountability Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Institution of Higher Education Enterprise Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1135710(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback