SC S0279 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The South Carolina Real Estate Appraiser License And Certification Act, To Provide Certain Definitions, To Require Registration For An Entity Acting As An Appraisal Management Company, To Specify Registration And Renewal Requirements, To Provide Exemptions From Registration, To Provide For The Conduct Of Appraisal Management Companies, And To Provide Remedies For Violations; To Amend Section 40-60-10(b), Relating To The South Carolina Real Estate Appraisers Board, To Provide For Eight Members To Include One Member Representing An Appraisal Management Company; And To Redesignate Chapter 60, Title 40 As "real Estate Appraisers And Appraisal Management Companies".
Title
Appraisal Management Company Registration Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Act No. 32 | |
2017-05-17 | Effective date See Act | |
2017-05-10 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Ratified R 52 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-1 |
2017-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |