SC S0278 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Recommitted to Committee on Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Recommitted to Committee on Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "cervical Cancer Prevention Act", To Provide That Beginning With The 2015-2016 School Year, The Department Of Health And Environmental Control May Offer The Cervical Cancer Vaccination Series To Adolescent Students Enrolling In The Seventh Grade Of Any Public Or Private School In This State, To Provide That No Student Is Required To Have The Vaccine Before Enrolling In Or Attending School, To Provide That The Department May Develop An Informational Brochure Related To Offering This Vaccination With Specific Content Requirements, To Define "cervical Cancer Vaccination Series", And To Provide That Implementation Of This Act Is Contingent Upon Receipt Of Full Funding By State And Federal Funds.
Title
Cervical Cancer Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. Kevin Johnson [D] | Sen. Joel Lourie [D] | Sen. John Scott [D] |
Sen. Karl Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3204 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Act No. 151