SC S0277 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revise Certain Exemptions; To Redesignate Chapter 67, Title 40 As "speech-language Pathologists And Audiologists"; And To Repeal Act 124 Of 2015 Relating To The Temporary Exemption Of Certain Applicants For Licensure As Speech-language Pathology Assistants From The Requirement Of Having A Bachelor's Degree From A Regionally Accredited Institution Of Higher Education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Speech-Language Pathologists Assistants exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Act No. 34
2019-05-17 Effective date 05/13/19
2019-05-13 Signed By Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 47
2019-05-08HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-07HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2019-05-07HouseRead second time
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-06SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-05SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-03-05SenateRead second time
2019-03-05SenateAmended
2019-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0313 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
406720(n/a)See Bill Text
4067260(n/a)See Bill Text
4067280(n/a)See Bill Text
406730(n/a)See Bill Text
4067300(n/a)See Bill Text
406775(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback