SC S0276 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Applicants Applying To The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation For Licensure As A Residential Builder Or Registration As A Residential Specialty Contractor To Disclose And Describe Any Criminal Convictions, Except For Minor Traffic Violations, On His Application, To Provide The Commission Shall Require An Applicant For Initial Licensure To Submit To A Fingerprint-based Criminal Background Check In This State And In Any State Where He Discloses Having A Conviction, To Provide Similar Requirements For Applicants Seeking Renewals, To Impose Related Administrative Requirements On The Commission, To Provide Penalties For Violations, And To Provide An Additional Penalty For Failing To Disclose Convictions Requiring Registration As A Sex Offender.
Title
Residential builders and contractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |