SC S0261 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Local Governments, By Adding Chapter 39, To Enact The South Carolina Commercial-property Assessed Clean Energy Act (c-pace), To Provide That Governing Bodies May Establish A District By Adoption Of An Ordinance For The Purpose Of Promoting, Encouraging, And Facilitating Clean Energy Improvements Within Its Geographic Area; To Provide Requirements To Be Included In The Ordinance; To Provide That Members Of The District And Owners Of Qualifying Real Property May Voluntarily Execute A Written Agreement To Participate In The Commercial-property Assessed Clean Energy Program; To Provide That The Governing Body Has The Authority To Impose An Assessment On The Qualifying Real Property; To Provide That The Assessment Shall Constitute A C-pace Lien Against The Qualifying Real Property Until Paid, Subject To The Consent Of Existing Mortgagees; To Provide How Clean Energy Improvements May Be Financed; To Provide That Clean Energy Improvements Must Meet All Applicable Safety, Performance, Interconnection, And Reliability Standards; And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
SC Commercial-Property Assessed Clean Energy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |