SC S0261 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Remove Criteria Providing These Persons May Receive No Compensation As Full-time Employees
Title
Persons age sixty and over attending classes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Act No. 50 | |
2015-06-08 | Effective date 06/03/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-02 | Ratified R 81 | |
2015-05-28 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 |
2015-05-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-27-15 |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-04-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |