SC S0261 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Not Adopt Certain Provisions Relating To The Reduction On Itemized Deductions And The Reduction On The Personal Exemption
Title
Internal Revenue Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Act No. 10 | |
2013-04-19 | Effective date 04/09/13 | |
2013-04-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-04-09 | Ratified R 14 | |
2013-03-22 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-03-21 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2013-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-03-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2013-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3617 (Similar To) 2013-02-27 - Committed to Committee on Ways and Means