SC S0254 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Define The Term "supervisory College"
Title
Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 48 | |
2017-05-26 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 69 | |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-1 |
2017-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-02-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |