SC S0247 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit Any Changes To Public Education Academic Standards, Assessments, Cut Scores, And Ratings Currently Used In This State Until July 1, 2024, At Which Time The Department Of Education Shall Examine The Achievement Of Students Based On The Standards Applicable From July 1, 2019 To June 31, 2024 And Make Recommendations To The General Assembly About Any Appropriate Changes To These Academic Standards, Assessments, Cut Scores, And Ratings Based On The Findings Of Its Examination.
Title
Academic standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0247&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/247_20181212.htm |