SC S0244 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
By Repealing Section 50-11-940 Relating To The Designation Of Certain Property Of The Belle W. Baruch Foundation In Georgetown County As A Bird And Game Refuge; And By Repealing Section 50-11-941 Providing That Provisions Of Section 50-11-940 Must Not Be Construed To Be In Conflict With The Last Will And Testament Of Belle W. Baruch
Title
Belle W. Baruch Foundation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Act No. 4 | |
2013-03-11 | Effective date 03/04/13 | |
2013-03-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-02-27 | Ratified R 4 | |
2013-02-22 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-02-21 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2013-02-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-0 |
2013-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-20 | House | Delegation report: Favorable with amendment Georgetown Delegation |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Georgetown Delegation |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |