SC S0241 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-112-50, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Definition Of "covered Individual" For The Purposes Of Tuition Rates For Military Personnel And Their Dependents, So As To Eliminate The Requirement That A Veteran Or Dependent Enroll In A Public Institution Of Higher Education Within Three Years Of The Veteran's Discharge In Order To Receive Educational Assistance. - Ratified Title
Title
Military tuition rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Act No. 29 | |
2021-05-13 | Effective date 05/06/21 | |
2021-05-04 | Ratified R 42 | |
2021-05-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-29 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |