SC S0231 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "student Identification Card Suicide Prevention Act" By Adding Section 59-1-375 So As To Provide Student Identification Cards Issued By Public Schools And Public And Private Institutions Of Higher Learning Must Include Certain Contact Information Concerning The National Suicide Prevention Lifeline And Certain Other Crisis Resources, To Make These Provisions Applicable To Cards Issued Or Replaced After The Effective Date Of This Act, And To Provide Schools And Institutions Of Higher Learning Annually Shall Certify To Their Governing Bodies That Contact Information Required By This Act Has Been Reviewed And Updated As Necessary; To Allow The Depletion Of Existing Supplies Of Nonconforming, Unissued Cards; And To Make The Provisions Of This Act Effective July 1, 2022. - Ratified Title
Title
Student Identification Card Suicide Prevention Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 45 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 07/01/22 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 58 | |
2021-05-06 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-05-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-04 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-04-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3476 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox, Elliott