SC S0231 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Remove Specific References To Nonprofit Organizations.
Title
Sale of beer and wine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-2 | |
2011-02-23 | Read second time | |
2011-02-22 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-02-16 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-08 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-08 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3178 (Similar To) 2011-06-27 - Act No. 66