SC S0229 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Debate adjourned until Thur., 6-2-16
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Debate adjourned until Thur., 6-2-16
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Remedies For Causing Or Permitting Pollution Of The Environment, To Clarify That Persons Who May File A Petition With The Department Does Not Include A Department, Agency, Commission, Department, Or Political Subdivision Of The State, And To Provide For Department Decisions That Are Not Subject To Judicial Review In A Civil Proceeding; To Amend Section 6 Of Act 198 Of 2012, Relating To The Savings Clause, To Provide That The Savings Clause Of Act 198 Applies Only To Cases Filed Before June 6, 2012, And Any Federal Project For Which A Final Environmental Impact Statement Was Issued Prior To June 6, 2012, But No Record Of Decision Was Issued Prior To June 6, 2012.
Title
Pollution of the environment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 6-2-16 |
2016-05-31 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-1-16 |
2016-05-17 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-05-05 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-2 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-03-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Special order, set for March 17, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Medical Affairs |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3371 (Similar To) 2015-01-21 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary