SC S0226 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 63-1-50(f) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Joint Citizens And Legislative Committee On Children, To Reauthorize The Committee Through December 31, 2030.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Citizens and Legislative Committee on Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3211 (Similar To) 2021-03-03 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63150(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback