SC S0218 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That Political Subdivisions Of The State May Not Establish, Mandate, Or Otherwise Require Employee Benefits, And To Define Necessary Terms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee benefit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 68 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17 Act No. 3
2017-04-13 Effective date 4/5/17
2017-04-05 Signed By Governor
2017-04-04 Ratified R 9
2017-03-23HouseRead third time and enrolled
2017-03-22HouseRoll call Yeas-73 Nays-29
2017-03-22HouseRead second time
2017-03-09HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-03-07HouseCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-02-08SenateRead third time and sent to House
2017-02-07SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-8
2017-02-07SenateRead second time
2017-02-02SenateDebate interrupted
2017-01-31SenateSpecial order, set for January 31, 2017
2017-01-26SenateCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41125(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback