SC S0214 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-36-71 So As To Define "marketplace Facilitator"; To Amend Sections 12-36-70, 12-36-90, And 12-36-130, All Relating To Sales Tax Definitions, So As To Further Inform Marketplace Facilitators Of Their Requirements; And To Amend Section 12-36-1340, Relating To The Collection Of Sales Tax By Retailers, So As To Further Inform Marketplace Facilitators Of Their Requirements. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax definitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number 6 (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 5 (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: To Reconsider The Adoption Of Am. 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number 3 (Y: 22 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 2a (Y: 22 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number 2a (Y: 22 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Act No. 21
2019-05-03 Effective date 04/26/19
2019-04-26 Signed By Governor
2019-04-25 Ratified R 33
2019-04-05HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-04-04HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2019-04-04HouseRead second time
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-13SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-3
2019-03-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-13SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-01-29SenateAmended
2019-01-23SenateRead second time
2019-01-17 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-16SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1236130(n/a)See Bill Text
12361340(n/a)See Bill Text
123670(n/a)See Bill Text
123671(n/a)See Bill Text
123690(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0214&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/214_20181212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/214_20190116.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/214_20190117.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/214_20190129.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/214_20190313.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/214_20190327.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16091
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16274
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15536
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15537
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15539
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15540
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15541
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15542
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16089

Bill Comments 750

feedback