SC S0214 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To The South Carolina Sales And Use Tax Act, By Adding Section 12-36-71, To Provide That A Retailer Is Presumed To Be Liable For The Sales Tax Or Responsible For Collecting And Remitting The Use Tax If The Retailer Enters Into An Agreement With A Resident Of This State Under Which The Resident, For A Commission Or Consideration, Refers Potential Customers, Whether By An Internet Link Or Otherwise, To Require Such Retailers To Obtain A Retail License And Remit Sales And Use Tax On All Taxable Retail Sales, And To Provide Exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-15HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-02-14SenateRead third time and sent to House
2017-01-31SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-5
2017-01-31SenateRead second time
2017-01-24SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
123671(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback