SC S0214 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Include The Public Hearing Testimony Of A Judicial Candidate Who Withdraws At The Public Hearing After Offering His Testimony.
Title
Judicial Merit Selection Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-12-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |