SC S0214 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Make Conforming Changes; And To Repeal Section 40-30-65 Relating To The Creation And Structure Of The Disciplinary Panel, Section 40-30-70 Relating To Duties Of The Disciplinary Panel, And Section 40-30-210 Relating To Procedures Before The Disciplinary Panel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage/Bodywork Practice Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-18 Act No. 41
2013-06-18 Effective date 06/07/13
2013-06-07 Signed By Governor
2013-06-04 Ratified R 48
2013-05-22HouseRead third time and enrolled
2013-05-21HouseRoll call Yeas-89 Nays-0
2013-05-21HouseRead second time
2013-05-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2013-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2013-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2013-03-14 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-03-13SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-2
2013-03-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2013-03-13SenateAmended
2013-03-06SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2013-03-06SenateRead second time
2013-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2013-03-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2013-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4030110(n/a)See Bill Text
4030200(n/a)See Bill Text
4030210(n/a)See Bill Text
4030220(n/a)See Bill Text
4030230(n/a)See Bill Text
4030240(n/a)See Bill Text
4030250(n/a)See Bill Text
4030260(n/a)See Bill Text
4030270(n/a)See Bill Text
403030(n/a)See Bill Text
4030300(n/a)See Bill Text
4030310(n/a)See Bill Text
403040(n/a)See Bill Text
403050(n/a)See Bill Text
403060(n/a)See Bill Text
403065(n/a)See Bill Text
403070(n/a)See Bill Text
403090(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0214&session=120&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130110.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130221.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130222.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130306.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130313.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130314.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/214_20130515.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=5480
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=5730
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6257

Bill Comments 750

feedback