SC S0213 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 2-1-60 So As To Provide That No Person Is Eligible For Election To The House Of Representatives If That Person Has Served Six Terms In The Same Body, That No Person Is Eligible For Election To The Senate If That Person Has Served Three Terms In The Same Body, And To Provide That Any Term Served, For Which The Election Was Held Prior To January 1, 2024, Must Not Be Counted As A Term Served.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Term limits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2022-11-30SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-11-30SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3249 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: A.M.Morgan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2160(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback