SC S0213 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create The College And University Trustee Screening Commission To Consider The Qualifications Of Candidates For Trustees To State-supported Colleges And Universities, To Provide For The Membership Of The Commission, And To Provide For The Investigative, Nomination, And Election Processes
Title
College and University Trustee Screening Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Act No. 17 | |
2017-05-12 | Effective date 5/9/17 | |
2017-05-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-04 | Ratified R 26 | |
2017-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |