SC S0208 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Read third time and sent to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 59-19-350(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Schools Of Choice, To Provide That School Districts May Instead Create Multiple Schools Of Innovation, And To Provide That Each Exemption From State Statutes And Regulations By Schools Of Innovation Must Be Approved By A Two-thirds Vote Of The State Board Of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School of choice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-03-03SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
2021-03-03SenateRead second time
2021-03-03SenateAmended
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-02SenateSpecial order, set for March 2, 2021
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5919350(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback