SC S0200 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 24-3-530, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Death By Electrocution Or Lethal Injection, So As To Provide That A Person Sentenced To Death Shall Suffer The Penalty By Electrocution Or By Firing Squad Or Lethal Injection, If Lethal Injection Is Available At The Time Of Election, To Provide That An Election Expires And Must Be Renewed In Writing If The Convicted Person Receives A Stay Of Execution Or The Execution Date Has Passed, To Provide That A Penalty Must Be Administered By Electrocution For A Person Who Waives His Right Of Election, To Provide That The Director Of The Department Of Corrections Shall Determine And Certify To The Supreme Court Whether The Method Selected Is Available, And To Provide That The Manner Of Inflicting A Death Sentence Must Be Electrocution, Unless The Person Elects Death By Firing Squad, If Execution By Lethal Injection Is Unavailable Or Is Held To Be Unconstitutional By An Appellate Court Of Competent Jurisdiction. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Executions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number Rfh-2 (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number Rfh-1 (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 43 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Table Amendment 14 Amendment Number 14 (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Table Amendment 13 Amendment Number 13 (Y: 75 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Table Amendment 12 Amendment Number 12 (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 72 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 43
2021-06-01 Effective date 05/14/21
2021-05-14 Signed By Governor
2021-05-13 Ratified R 56
2021-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-11
2021-05-12SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2021-05-06HouseRoll call Yeas-65 Nays-43
2021-05-06HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-05-05HouseRoll call Yeas-66 Nays-43
2021-05-05HouseRead second time
2021-05-05HouseAmended
2021-05-04HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-03SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-03-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-02SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-11
2021-03-02SenateRead second time
2021-03-02SenateAmended
2021-02-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report: Favorable Corrections and Penology
2021-02-02SenatePolled out of committee Corrections and Penology
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3755 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
243530(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0200&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/200_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/200_20210202.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/200_20210203.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/200_20210302.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/200_20210303.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/200_20210428.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/200_20210505.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0200%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0200%202021-01-12%20updated.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0200%202021-04-28%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18502
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19533
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19540
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19541
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19542
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19543
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19546
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19556
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19705
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19709
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19710

Bill Comments

feedback