SC S0199 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Required Stops For Vehicles, By Adding A New Section, To Allow The Department Of Public Safety To Obtain A Civil Penalty Citation Against The Registered Owner Of A Vehicle Violating Section 56-5-2770 And To Provide A Method To Appeal The Citation.
Title
Department of Public Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-29 Nays-10 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |