SC S0195 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-37-2650, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Issuance Of Tax Notices And Paid Receipts And The Delegation Of Collection Of Taxes, So As To Provide That The Tax Notice Must Set Forth The Fair Market Value Used For The Vehicle.
Title
Tax notices and paid receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |