SC S0191 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-7-2320 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Kinship Foster Care Program, To Provide That Fictive Kin Are Eligible To Be Foster Parents Under The Kinship Foster Care Program; To Provide That Relatives And Fictive Kin May Foster A Child Before Being Licensed As A Kinship Foster Care Provider Under Certain Circumstances; And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
Kinship foster care program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-02-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |