SC S0185 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Requirements For Funeral Service Advertisements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funeral service providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20 Act No. 135
2018-03-14 Effective date 03/12/18
2018-03-12 Signed By Governor
2018-03-07 Ratified R 139
2018-02-13SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2018-02-13SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2018-02-06HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
2018-02-06HouseRead second time
2018-02-06HouseAmended
2018-02-01HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-03-16SenateRead third time and sent to House
2017-03-15SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2017-03-15SenateRead second time
2017-03-15SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2017-03-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-03-09SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-13SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2016-12-13SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4019110(n/a)See Bill Text
401920(n/a)See Bill Text
401940(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback