SC S0181 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 63-9-80, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Required Disclosure Of Information To A Prospective Adoptive Parent, So As To Allow A Biological Parent To Provide Personal Medical History At The Time Of Adoption Consent Or Relinquishment, And To Require That Such Information Be Disclosed To The Prospective Adoptive Parent And To The Adoptee Upon Reaching The Age Of Majority Or Prior To The Age Of Majority For Good Cause Shown. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-02 Act No. 144
2020-10-02 Effective date 09/28/20
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 150
2020-09-24HouseRead third time and enrolled
2020-09-23HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2020-09-23HouseRead second time
2020-09-23HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2020-09-22HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 9-23-20
2020-02-19HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-17-20
2019-05-08HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-20SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-02-19SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-02-19SenateRead second time
2019-02-19SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-02-13SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on General
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63980(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback