SC S0180 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 7, Chapter 11, Title 16 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Trespasses And The Unlawful Use Of The Property Of Others, By Adding Section 16-11-605, To Provide That It Is Unlawful To Operate An Unmanned Aerial Vehicle Within A Certain Distance Of A Federal Military Installation; To Provide For Disposition Of A Confiscated Unmanned Aerial Vehicle; To Provide For Exceptions; And To Provide Penalties For The Violation.
Title
Unmanned Aerial Vehicles; trespassing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), McElveen, Kimpson, Rice, Senn |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |